Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs. Pollington
On September 27, 2012 a pi/pd/wd - auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 27, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Medel, Kenneth;Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 11 months and 8 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Munoz, Ofelia |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason |
|
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and against Munoz, Ofelia ;Pollington, Jason for $ 5132.30, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 268.71, prejudgment costs: $ 354.40, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 5755.41. | |
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason; Munoz, Ofelia |
|
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Default Court Judgment Documents Location changed to Dept 61 | |
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Munoz, Ofelia; Pollington, Jason |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (Approved Form Only) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (Ofelia Munoz) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Munoz, Ofelia |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | ** DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ** | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Munoz, Ofelia |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | The default filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company was entered as to Pollington, Jason; Munoz, Ofelia on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used. | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | ********Default Received******** | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Jason Pollington) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Reassignment generated on 11/18/12 shows mailing occurred at Sacramento on 11/19/12 but it was actually mailed on 11/20/12. | |
November 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to Meyer,John effective 11/18/2012 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Munoz, Ofelia |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason; Munoz, Ofelia |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.
Judge: Medel Kenneth |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason; Munoz, Ofelia |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pollington, Jason; Munoz, Ofelia |
|