Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Garcia vs. Maguire
On October 30, 2012 a harassment case was filed by Garcia, Veronica, against Maguire, Robert, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
3 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (CH-130) filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Maguire, Robert | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (CH-130 Order After Hearing) filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Maguire, Robert | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against ROBERT MAGUIRE was granted. | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 11/20/2012 08:30:00 AM. | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Maguire, Robert | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition (TRO) filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Maguire, Robert | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Martinez, Roberto; Martinez, Veronica; Martinez, Madeline; Maguire, Robert | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/30/2012 11:00:00 AM. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | The Temporary Restraining Order as requested against ROBERT MAGUIRE was granted. Hearing on Restraining Order set for 11/20/2012 at 08:30AM before E-21. All orders to remain in full force and effect pending date of hearing with a 100 yards stay away order. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Maguire, Robert | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department E-21. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Maguire, Robert | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 10/30/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 . | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Veronica. Refers to: Martinez, Roberto; Martinez, Veronica; Martinez, Madeline; Maguire, Robert |