Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
P A PARC Vista L P vs. Picardi
On October 30, 2012 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
11 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 11/08/2013 at 08:35:00 AM at Central in C-05 was vacated. | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to T P G R Investments LLC. | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by P A PARC Vista L P; P A Cambridge L P; T P G R Investments LLC. |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Picardi, Stephanie . | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to P A Cambridge L P. | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to P A PARC Vista L P. | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 11/08/2013 at 08:35:00 AM at Central in C-05 . |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by P A PARC Vista L P; P A Cambridge L P; T P G R Investments LLC. Refers to: Picardi, Stephanie |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by P A PARC Vista L P; P A Cambridge L P; T P G R Investments LLC. Refers to: Picardi, Stephanie |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-05. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by P A PARC Vista L P; P A Cambridge L P; T P G R Investments LLC. Refers to: Picardi, Stephanie |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|