Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Prime Group LLC vs. Mauck
On October 30, 2012 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Prime Group Llc, represented by Kremling-Calabrese, Karen M, against Mauck, Everett, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment RECV'D | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Prime Group LLC. |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Prime Group LLC and against Mauck, Everett for a grand total of $ 2817.24 . | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Prime Group LLC. |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | $$ DEFAULT MONEY AFTER JUDGMENT RECEIVED $$ | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (and Supporting Documents) filed by Prime Group LLC. |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Prime Group LLC. |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Prime Group LLC. Refers to: Mauck, Everett |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Prime Group LLC and against Mauck, Everett for a grand total of $ 0.00 . | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Prime Group LLC. |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Mauck, Everett on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Prime Group LLC . | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Includes All Unknowns) filed by Prime Group LLC. Refers to: Mauck, Everett |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Prime Group LLC. Refers to: Mauck, Everett |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | ****CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED****44964 | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Prime Group LLC. Refers to: Mauck, Everett |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Prime Group LLC. Refers to: Mauck, Everett |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-05. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Prime Group LLC. Refers to: Mauck, Everett |
|