Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Acosta vs. Walker
On October 22, 2012 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Acosta, William, and Acosta, Jenene, against Walker, Terrill C, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 22, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
5 years, 2 months and 11 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Walker, Terrill C, on 10/29/2012, has expired. | |
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Acosta, Jenene; Acosta, William rejected on 12/03/2012. |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ for Possession Writ of Possession issued. |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Acosta, Jenene ;Acosta, William and against Walker, Terrill C for a grand total of $ 2140.00 . | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 11/16/2012 01:30:00 PM. |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Judge: signed and filed |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Walker, Terrill C; Acosta, William; Acosta, Jenene. |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 11/16/2012 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-05 . |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Acosta, William; Acosta, Jenene. Refers to: Walker, Terrill |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Acosta, William; Acosta, Jenene. Refers to: Walker, Terrill |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Walker, Terrill C. |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Walker, Terrill C. | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Walker, Terrill C. |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Acosta, William; Acosta, Jenene. Refers to: Walker, Terrill |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-05. | |
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Acosta, William; Acosta, Jenene. Refers to: Walker, Terrill |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Acosta, William; Acosta, Jenene. Refers to: Walker, Terrill |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|