Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Shkoller vs. Malloy
On October 30, 2012 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Trial Verdict
Case Duration
5 years, 2 months and 3 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Malloy, Justin, on 11/07/2012, has expired. | |
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Shkoller, Boris. |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment rendered. | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 01/07/2013 08:10:00 AM. |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment rendered for Boris Shkoller and against Justin Malloy;Tessie Malloy for a grand total of 3175 . | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Shkoller, Boris and against Malloy, Justin ;Malloy, Tessie for a grand total of $ 3175.00 . | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Judge: signed and filed |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Tessie; Malloy, Justin |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order, Stipulation, and Oath for Temporary Judge filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Tessie; Malloy, Justin
Judge: filed by Shkoller Boris Refers to: Malloy Tessie; Malloy Justin |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (that Matters in Request for Admissions be Deemed Admitted and for Sanctions) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 01/07/2013 at 08:10:00 AM at North County in N-08 . |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Shkoller, Boris. |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Justin; Malloy, Tessie |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Judgment for Restitution of Premises Only submitted by Shkoller, Boris rejected on 11/20/2012. Refers to: Malloy, Justin; Malloy, Tessie |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Malloy, Tessie on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Shkoller, Boris . | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party - Default SD The default was denied as to Malloy, Justin on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Shkoller, Boris . |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Malloy, Justin. Refers to: Shkoller, Boris |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Malloy, Justin. Refers to: Malloy, Justin |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Shkoller, Boris. |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Justin |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Tessie |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-08. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Justin; Malloy, Tessie |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Justin; Malloy, Tessie |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Shkoller, Boris. Refers to: Malloy, Justin; Malloy, Tessie |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|