Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Oxen Investments, LLC vs. Walker
On October 22, 2012 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 22, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Trial Verdict
Case Duration
5 years, 2 months and 11 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Walker, Paul, on 11/06/2012, has expired. | |
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Walker, Sydney, on 11/06/2012, has expired. | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order, Stipulation, and Oath for Temporary Judge filed by Oxen Investments, LLC.
Judge: filed by Oxen Investments LLC |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. Refers to: Walker, Paul; Walker, Sydney |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 11/29/2012 08:10:00 AM. |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. Refers to: Walker, Paul; Walker, Sydney | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Oxen Investments, LLC and against Walker, Sydney ;Walker, Paul for a grand total of $ 7152.20 . | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Judge: signed and filed |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment rendered for Oxen Investments, LLC and against Sydney Walker;Paul Walker for a grand total of 7152.20 . | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Military Status) filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment rendered. | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Posting(UD) (Sydney Walker) filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. Refers to: Walker, Sydney |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Posting(UD) (Paul Walker) filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. Refers to: Walker, Paul |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 11/29/2012 at 08:10:00 AM at North County in N-08 . |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Walker, Sydney. |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Walker, Paul. |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Walker, Paul. | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Walker, Paul; Walker, Sydney. |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Walker, Sydney. | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER GRANTED) filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. Refers to: Walker, Paul; Walker, Sydney |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-08. | |
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. Refers to: Walker, Paul; Walker, Sydney |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oxen Investments, LLC. Refers to: Walker, Paul; Walker, Sydney |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons issued. |