Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kenneth Philip Ingrao vs. Colin Vernon Goodson
On June 30, 2010 a harassment case was filed by Ingrao, Kenneth Philip, against Goodson, Colin Vernon, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
6 years, 11 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 05/31/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Request for Order; Answer; Notice of Hearing; Reissue Temporary Restraining Order [ Colin Vernon Goodson served]) filed by Ingrao, Kenneth Philip. | |
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) dismissed without prejudice. | |
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 08/03/2010 01:30:00 PM. | |
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 08/03/2010 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-25 . | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Unsuccessful Service) filed by Ingrao, Kenneth Philip. Refers to: Goodson, Colin | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | The Hearing on Restraining Order was rescheduled to 08/03/2010 at 01:30:00 PM in C-25 before at Central. | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Reissue Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ingrao, Dominic Kenneth. Refers to: Goodson, Colin | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) filed by Ingrao, Kenneth Philip. Refers to: Ingrao, Dominic; Ingrao, Elena; Ingrao, Noelle; Ingrao, Summer; Goodson, Colin | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/30/2010 01:30:00 PM. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) filed by Ingrao, Kenneth Philip. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-25. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | The Temporary Restraining Order as requested against Colin Vernon Goodson was granted. Hearing on Restraining Order set for 07/16/2010 at 01:30PM before C-25. All orders to remain in full force and effect pending date of hearing with a 100 yard stay away order. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 06/30/2010 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-25 . | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case file location changed to County Courthouse,C-25. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ingrao, Kenneth Philip. |