Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Chihlung Chao vs. Kimberly Ann Fluharty
On December 01, 2010 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Chao, Chihlung, against Giles, Dustin A, and Fluharty, Kimberly Ann, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 month and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/25/2011 01:15:00 PM. |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 01/25/2011 at 01:15:00 PM at North County in N-08 . | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Application for Judgment for Restitution of Premises Only filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Fluharty, Kimberly Ann on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Chao, Chihlung . | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Fluharty, Kimberly AnnGiles, Dustin A on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Chao, Chihlung . | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Chao, Chihlung and against Fluharty, Kimberly Ann ;Giles, Dustin A for a grand total of $ 0.00 . | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Judgment for Restitution of Premises Only submitted by Chao, Chihlung rejected on 01/11/2011. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Giles, Dustin | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Judgment for Restitution of Premises Only submitted by Chao, Chihlung rejected on 12/29/2010. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Giles, Dustin | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Judgment for Restitution of Premises Only submitted by Chao, Chihlung rejected on 12/20/2010. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-08. | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Chao, Chihlung. Refers to: Fluharty, Kimberly; Giles, Dustin |