Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Steadfast Villa Nueva vs. Alma Cota
On December 06, 2010 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
7 years and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Cota, Alma, on 12/15/2010, has expired. | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (To Set Aside Judgment: Dismissla and Order Thereon) filed by Steadfast Villa Nueva. Refers to: Cota, Alma | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered. | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 01/10/2011 09:00:00 AM. |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Steadfast Villa Nueva; Cota, Alma. | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Cota, Alma. | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 01/10/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-02 . | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Steadfast Villa Nueva. Refers to: Cota, Alma | |
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Cota, Alma. Refers to: Steadfast Villa Nueva | |
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Cota, Alma. Refers to: Steadfast Villa Nueva | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Steadfast Villa Nueva. | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Steadfast Villa Nueva. | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department S-02. | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Steadfast Villa Nueva. |