Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Baker Recovery Services vs. Raymond F. Doran
On March 19, 2009 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Baker Recovery Services, represented by Trejo, Juana, against Doran, Raymond F; Aka : Doran, Ray F, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 19, 2009
Last Refreshed
November 01, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 years, 4 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution returned PARTIAL SATISFACTION | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (by clerk) filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Default judgment submitted by Baker Recovery Services rejected on 5/18/09. | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (by clerk) filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Doran, Raymond F. on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Baker Recovery Services . | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-03. | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed by Baker Recovery Services. Refers to: Doran, Raymond |