Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Joan Narzisi vs. Chad Brown
On March 19, 2009 a harassment case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 19, 2009
Last Refreshed
November 01, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 17 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 06/05/2009 08:30:00 AM. | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) dismissed without prejudice. | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer to Request for Orders to Stop Harassment filed by Brown, Chad. Refers to: Narzisi, Joan | |
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | The Hearing on Restraining Order was rescheduled to 06/05/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in N-07 before at North County. | |
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued to 06/05/2009 at 08:30 AM before N-07. | |
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 05/01/2009 08:30:00 AM. | |
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 06/05/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-07 . | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (no service of TRO) filed by Narzisi, Joan. Refers to: Brown, Chad | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Narzisi, Joan. Refers to: Brown, Chad | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 05/01/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-07 . | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 04/10/2009 08:30:00 AM. | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued to 05/01/2009 at 08:30 AM before N-07. | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | The Hearing on Restraining Order was rescheduled to 05/01/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in N-07 before at North County. | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (no service of TRO) filed by Narzisi, Joan. Refers to: Brown, Chad | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) filed by Narzisi, Joan. Refers to: Brown, Chad | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Narzisi, Joan. Refers to: Brown, Chad | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/19/2009 01:30:00 PM. | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-07. | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | The Court orders temporary restraining order granted as to CHAD BROWN. Hearing on Restraining Order set for 04/10/2009 at 08:30 AM before N-07. All orders to remain in full force and effect pending date of hearing with a 2 yards stay away order. | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 03/19/2009 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-07 . | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 04/10/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-07 . |