Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Linda Fleming vs. Barbara J. Brown
On December 04, 2009 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Fleming, Linda ; Dba : Fleming Property Managment, against Brown, Barbara J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 04, 2009
Last Refreshed
November 01, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Fleming, Linda and against Brown, Barbara J. for a grand total of $ 925.00 . | |
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara | |
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | $-Judgment received 01/27/10. | |
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Brown, Barbara J. on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Fleming, Linda . | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Fleming, Linda and against Brown, Barbara J. for a grand total of $ 0.00 . | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerks Judgment received on 12/30/2009 | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Includes all unknown occupants) filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Allowing Service of Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by Fleming, Linda. | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by Fleming, Linda. | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-05. | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Fleming, Linda. Refers to: Brown, Barbara |