Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY vs. Beelay Sanchez
On March 19, 2009 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Lahitte Sprague Management Company, represented by Relph, Christine M, against Sanchez, Beelay ; Aka : Sanches, Beelay, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 19, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
8 years, 9 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Sanchez, Beelay, on 03/27/2009, has expired. | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment Returned filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number (as to Plntff's aTTRNY) filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (with Interests : $1,252.00) filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RECV'D | |
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/29/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | The Plaintiff's Motion for Award for Attorney's Fees was granted . | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing (Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs) filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Attorney Fees (and Supporting Documents) filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/29/2009 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-05 . | |
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Return on Writ of Possession, Satisfied. | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY and against Beelay Sanchez for a grand total of $ 1610.00 . | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 04/28/2009 08:30:00 AM. |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY and against Sanchez, Beelay for a grand total of $ 1610.00 . | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 04/28/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-05 . |
|
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Sanchez, Beelay. | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Sanchez, Beelay. Refers to: LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-05. | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by LAHITTE SPRAGUE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Refers to: Sanchez, Beelay |