Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc vs. Norma R. Cossio
On January 17, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 11, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
9 years and 27 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event | *****Writ Received***** | |
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Interest 1839.32) filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. | |
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | *****Writ Received***** | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ Received | |
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution received 9/10/2008. | |
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Cossio, Norma R. on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc . | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Re Interest) filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Cardmember Agreement) filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Re Attorney Fees) filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Per CCP 1033) filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Location changed from $LOCATIONFROM to $LOCATIONTO | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Cossio, Norma | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-05. | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons Issued. |