Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Arrow Financial Services, LLC vs. Cynthia S Day
On January 17, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge William S. Cannon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 10, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
9 years, 1 month and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 02/14/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Day, Cynthia | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Location changed from Shelf to clerks judgment desk | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (approved as to form only) filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Day, Cynthia | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Clem, Mark | |
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Day, Cynthia S on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC . | |
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Day, Cynthia | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Day, Cynthia | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons Issued. | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Day, Cynthia | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Day, Cynthia | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Day, Cynthia; Clem, Mark | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.
Judge: Cannon William |