Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Application of the Upper New York Annual Conference of the United Methodist Church, a New York Religious Corporation, as successor-in-interest to The First Society of the United Methodist Church in Starkey formerly known as The …
On August 28, 2019 an other matters - sale or finance of religious/not for profit property case was filed in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY. Judge Jason L Cook presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 28, 2019
Last Refreshed
July 21, 2023
Filing Location
Yates County, NY
Filing Court House
Yates County Supreme Court
Judge
Category
Other Matters - Sale or Finance of Religious/Not for Profit Property
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
12 days
Parties
Case Documents
ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: Sep 09, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Aug 28, 2019PETITION
Date: Aug 28, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - EXPARTE | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Sale of Religious Property |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Secretary's Certificate |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Cabinet Resolutions |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Boundary Line Agreement |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Survey |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Purchase Agreement |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Starkey Certificate of Incorp. |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Names and Addresses |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Incorporation |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION |