Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SIERRA CLUB, COMMITTEE TO PRESERVE THE F vs. NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENT
A Sp-Cplr Article 78 (Body Or Officer) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY. Judge Kocher, Hon. William F. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2017
Last Refreshed
November 15, 2021
Filing Location
Yates County, NY
Category
SP-CPLR Article 78 (Body or Officer)
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Agency Action
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
11 months and 28 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2018 | hearing |
Dismissed Kocher (Court Activity) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
May 22, 2018 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
May 22, 2018 | hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
May 22, 2018 | hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
May 14, 2018 | hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
May 14, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 05/22/2018Decided Before Justice: Kocher, Hon. William F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
April 10, 2018 | hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
March 13, 2018 | hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 06, 2017 | hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |