Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ANGELO LICCIARDELLO ON HIS OWN BEHALF AN vs. TOWN OF JERUSALEM PLANNING BOARD AND TOW
A Sp-Cplr Article 78 (Body Or Officer) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY. Judge Cook, Hon. Jason L. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 23, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 16, 2021
Filing Location
Yates County, NY
Judge
Category
SP-CPLR Article 78 (Body or Officer)
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Agency Action
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
March 26, 2020 | hearing |
Cook (Hearing)
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 07, 2020 | hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 02, 2020 | hearing |
Stay Cook (Court Activity) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
September 24, 2019 | hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
July 16, 2019 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
July 16, 2019 | hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
July 09, 2019 | hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
July 09, 2019 | hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
May 29, 2019 | hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
May 29, 2019 | hearing |
Cook (Court Activity)
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
May 29, 2019 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 07/16/2019Decided Before Justice: Cook, Hon. Jason L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
April 11, 2019 | hearing |
Dismissed Cook (Court Activity) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
March 19, 2019 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
March 19, 2019 | hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
March 19, 2019 | hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
March 01, 2019 | hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/19/2019Decided Before Justice: Cook, Hon. Jason L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 22, 2019 | hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 02, 2019 | hearing |
Reassignment Kocher (Court Activity) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 11, 2018 | hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
October 23, 2018 | hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |