Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC BANK USA, NA vs. VICTOR J PAIGE, JR; AND JOHN DOE #1 THRO
A Rp-Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY. Judge Kocher, Hon. William F. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2016
Last Refreshed
September 19, 2021
Filing Location
Yates County, NY
Category
RP-Other
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 14 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2017 | hearing |
Decided Kocher (Court Activity) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 24, 2017 | hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 24, 2017 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 24, 2017 | hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 12, 2016 | hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 01/24/2017Decided Before Justice: Kocher, Hon. William F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |