Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America, N.A. v. Kori M Faneytt
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by Bank Of America, N.A., represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Kori M Faneytt, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 21, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 31, 2024
Filing Location
Westchester County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Case Complaint Summary
This legal document is a complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Kori M Faneytt. The complaint seeks judgment in the amount of $6,693.61, which includes a charge-off balance, post charge-off interest, and other balance adjustments. It pr…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: Jan 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 04, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Dec 21, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 21, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
January 04, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 04, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Billing Statement |
||
December 21, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |