Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mack-Cali Cw Realty Associates, Llc (150 Clearbrook Road) v. Greenburgh Town
On December 02, 2016 a real property - tax certiorari case was filed by Mack-Cali Cw Realty Associates, Llc, represented by Wilkes, David, against Greenburgh Town, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. Judge Bruce E Tolbert presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Westchester County, NY
Filing Court House
Westchester County Supreme Court
Judge
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI)
Date: Dec 02, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI) |