Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cavalry Spv I Llc v. Penny Dufour
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff case was filed by Cavalry Spv I Llc, represented by Owsiany, Grzegorz, against Penny Dufour, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 21, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Warren County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Overview
Causes of Action
AND FOR A FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION
AND FOR A SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
EXECUTION
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 22, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 22, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Nov 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 22, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Nov 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 22, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: Aug 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 29, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 21, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
November 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
November 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY |
||
November 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 22, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
November 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT BUYER |
||
November 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL |
||
November 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING |
||
August 12, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 21, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT PENNY DUFOUR |
||
July 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |