Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Michael Cagnetto v. Andrew Buchanan And, Sean Buchanan
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. Judge Christopher Modelewski presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2020
Last Refreshed
July 23, 2023
Filing Location
Suffolk County, NY
Judge
Hon. Christopher Modelewski
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
1. AGAINST THE DEFENDANT, ANDREW BUCHANAN AND SEAN BUCHANAN
causes of action alleged herein.
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jun 07, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 07, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: Sep 28, 2021ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: May 14, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 27, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Jan 27, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Jan 26, 2021ANSWER
Date: Oct 05, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: Sep 30, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 10, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION TO E-FILE |
||
June 07, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) FULLY EXECUTED SOD |
||
September 28, 2021 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT 10/13/2021 ADR 2 TEAMS MEETING |
||
May 14, 2021 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
January 27, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 27, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
January 26, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
October 05, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
October 05, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 30, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 10, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |