Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cole Candy & Tobacco Company, Inc. v. Rosario D. Distefano, Antonino D. Distefano
A Special Proceedings - Other (Domesticate Judgment) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. Judge Joseph Farneti presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 08, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Suffolk County, NY
Category
Special Proceedings - Other (Domesticate Judgment)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Judgment Enforcement
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Jun 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jun 21, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jun 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Jun 21, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: Jun 21, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: Oct 18, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: Oct 17, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Oct 07, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 01, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jun 08, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Jun 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: Apr 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Apr 08, 2021SUMMONS
Date: Apr 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Apr 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Apr 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Apr 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Apr 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Apr 08, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Apr 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Apr 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 08, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Supplemental Mailing of Summons |
||
June 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice to Cure |
||
June 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation |
||
June 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Non-Military Affirmation |
||
June 21, 2022 | Bill of Costs | ||
October 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
October 07, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 01, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001) Stipulation of Settlement Requesting "SO ORDER" to Enter Judgment |
||
June 08, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Sitp to adj Mot & stay action |
||
June 01, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
June 01, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 08, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
April 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 08, 2021 | SUMMONS | ||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Judgment |
||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C All Court Pleadings |
||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D PA Statute |
||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavits of Service |
||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E PA Code Rule 237.3 |
||
April 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
April 08, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT |