Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Leaf Capital Funding, Llc v. Q Foods, Inc., Grove Market, Inc., Parminder Sethi
On March 13, 2019 a commercial - contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 13, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Suffolk County, NY
Filing Court House
Suffolk County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Duration
6 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 07, 2019ORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED) Corrected
Date: Jul 10, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 15, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 13, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Additional Mailing |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Guaranty |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Guaranties |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Damages Calculation Sheet |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Restructure Agreement |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Lease-Loan Agreement |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint |