Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-Cw1 v. Charis Nicholson, Clerk Of The Suffolk County District Court, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The …
A Foreclosure (Residential Mortgage) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. Judge Foreclosure Conference Justice presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 10, 2013
Last Refreshed
July 22, 2023
Filing Location
Suffolk County, NY
Judge
Hon. Foreclosure Conference Justice
Category
Foreclosure (residential mortgage)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
1 year and 8 months
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Aug 14, 2014REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Feb 19, 2013ANSWER
Date: Feb 04, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 31, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 30, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 28, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2014 | hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification Foreclosure Prog East/Riverhead Supreme Trial; STD 8/7/14, F8/21/14 & 9/9EFILE (Conversion) Judge: Foreclosure, Conference Justice, |
|
September 11, 2014 | hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: LOAN MOD (R) FORECLOSURE PROG EAST/RIVERHEAD STD 8/7/14 F8/21/14 & 9/9EFILE Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE JUSTICE |
|
August 14, 2014 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 15, 2014 | hearing |
Continued Foreclosure Prog East/Riverhead Supreme Trial; 9AM, TLM (Conversion) Judge: Foreclosure, Conference Justice, |
|
July 15, 2014 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLOSURE PROG EAST/RIVERHEAD 9AM TLM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE JUSTICE |
|
April 17, 2014 | hearing |
Continued Foreclr Conf Riverhead Rm 128A Supreme Trial; 9AM (Conversion) Judge: Foreclosure, Conference Justice, |
|
April 17, 2014 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLR CONF RIVERHEAD RM 128A 9AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE JUSTICE |
|
February 07, 2014 | hearing |
Continued Foreclr Conf Riverhead Rm 128A Supreme Initial (first time on); 9AM (Conversion) Judge: Foreclosure, Conference Justice, |
|
February 07, 2014 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLR CONF RIVERHEAD RM 128A 9AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE JUSTICE |
|
January 27, 2014 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
August 20, 2013 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 20, 2013 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
February 19, 2013 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
February 04, 2013 | ANSWER | ||
January 31, 2013 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
January 31, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-CLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT |
||
January 31, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-CHARIS NICHOLSON |
||
January 30, 2013 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
January 30, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- LENOX WADE AS JOHN DOE #1 |
||
January 30, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-LOURDER NICHOLSON AS JOHN DOE #2 |
||
January 28, 2013 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
January 28, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS |
||
January 28, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing-LOURDER NICHOLSON AS JOHN DOE #2 |
||
January 28, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing-LENOX WADE AS JOHN DOE #1 |
||
January 10, 2013 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
January 10, 2013 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Secured |