Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank v. Dean Lafemina
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by Discover Bank, represented by Scully, James Paul, against Dean Lafemina, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 28, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 06, 2023
Filing Location
Rockland County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Apr 12, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Apr 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Apr 12, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Apr 12, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Apr 12, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: Jun 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 28, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
April 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 12, 2022 | ||
April 12, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
April 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
April 12, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
April 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
June 03, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
May 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 28, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |