Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Dolly James v. Binu Augustine, Rachel Varghese, Sajan Augustine
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Rockland County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 22, 2021
Last Refreshed
July 22, 2023
Filing Location
Rockland County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Confession of Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 05, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 06, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 06, 2021CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)
Date: Apr 22, 2021JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: Apr 22, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 22, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT By Sheriff Execution |
||
August 06, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
August 06, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 06, 2021 | ||
April 22, 2021 |
CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Affidavits of Binu Augustine, Rachel Varghese, and Sajan Augustine |
||
April 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) | ||
April 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 22, 2021 |