Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Elvira Sheikovitz v. Northwest Kendall Properties, Inc., Burger King Corporation, Burger King #601, Burger King Restaurants, Consumer Food Services, L.L.C.
On June 30, 2017 a torts - other (premises liability) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. Judge Judith N. Mcmahon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 30, 2017
Last Refreshed
July 30, 2023
Filing Location
Richmond County, NY
Filing Court House
Richmond County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other (Premises Liability)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 3 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 07, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Nov 14, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Nov 06, 2018ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: Oct 24, 2018STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: Jul 12, 2018STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: Apr 23, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: Sep 22, 2017ANSWER
Date: Sep 19, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: Aug 24, 2017ANSWER
Date: Aug 02, 2017SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: Jun 30, 2017SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 30, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 10, 2019 | hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONF/MEDIATION PART 9:30 AM ROOM 114 18 RICHMOND TERRACE Judge: REFEREE ROBERT W SOOS |
|
May 20, 2019 | hearing |
CONFERENCE HELD SETTLEMENT CONF/MEDIATION PART 9:30 AM ROOM 114 18 RICHMOND TERRACE Judge: REFEREE ROBERT W SOOS |
|
April 08, 2019 | hearing |
CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 6 REFER SCP Judge: JUDITH N MCMAHON |
|
March 04, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 6 PT Judge: JUDITH N MCMAHON |
|
January 31, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 6 PT Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
December 05, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 6 PTC Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Certification Order |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A So-Ordered Stipulation granting Special Trial Preference |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Affirmation in Compliance | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation granting Special Preference |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | |
October 24, 2018 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD DCM PART 6 CC Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
September 25, 2018 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD DCM PART 6 CC Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
July 17, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 6 CC Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCOVERY Stip to Adjourn Conference |
|
May 22, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 6 CC Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
May 02, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 6 CC Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 08, 2018 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD DCM PART 6 PC @11:00AM Judge: ALAN C MARIN |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) of Consumer Food Services, L.L.C. |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER (AMENDED) | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER on behalf of Burger King Corporation (improperly sued as Burger King #601 and Burger King Restaurant |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Defendant Burger King #601 - personal service |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Burger King Restaurants - personal service |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through Secy of State Defendant Consumer Food Services |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through Secy of State Defendant Burger King Restaurants |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through Secy of State Defendant Burger King #601 |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through Secretary of State Deft Northwest Kendall Properties |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through Secy of State Defendant Burger King Corporation |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic Filing |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |