Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jorge Gonzalez v. Joseph Depinto, Gaeta Interior Demolition, Inc., Dolores Malech
On November 30, 2012 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. Judge Kim Dollard presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Richmond County, NY
Filing Court House
Richmond County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 9 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Feb 08, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 08, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 08, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 21, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 02, 2013ANSWER
Date: May 02, 2013ANSWER
Date: Mar 08, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Mar 08, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 29, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 24, 2012SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 30, 2012Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 08, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer w cross-claim and aos |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-File authorization |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSEPH DEPINTO |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOLORES MALECH |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |