Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York v. J Barr Construction Corp
On January 09, 2008 a workers comp app for judgement case was filed by Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York, represented by Herron, Scott A, against J Barr Construction Corp, in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 09, 2008
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Workers Comp App for Judgement
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Workers Compensation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Jan 10, 2008WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: Jan 09, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED IN THE OFFICE OF THE COUNTY CLERK ON JANUARY 10, 2008 | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT Judgment Package |