Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
100 05 92nd Avenue Realty v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, AND THE COMMISSIONER OF FINANCE OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK
On October 22, 2007 a tax certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 22, 2007
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Duration
1 year, 5 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation of Discontinuance (Fee required - 35.00)
Date: Apr 10, 2009TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
Date: Oct 22, 2007Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation of Discontinuance (Fee required - 35.00) | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED |