Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
H.S. Brothers Corp. v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, AND THE COMMISSIONER OF FINANCE OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK
On October 16, 2007 a tax certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 16, 2007
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Duration
6 years, 6 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Apr 21, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 21, 2014TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
Date: Oct 16, 2007Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED |