Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Maxim Capital Enterprises Inc. v. Brandon Maraj
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction case was filed by Maxim Capital Enterprises Inc., represented by Geller, Morse, against Brandon Maraj, in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 28, 2024
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a consumer credit transaction case filed by Maxim Capital Enterprises, Inc. against Brandon Maraj in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Queens County. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant resides in Queens County an…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jan 19, 2024JUDGMENT
Date: Jan 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 11, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Sep 20, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 03, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 19, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Also included hereunder: SOL / Plntff Afft Facts inc 5004 Rate / Contract Copy / 2nd Mailing / Non- Also included hereunder: SOL / Plntff Afft Facts inc 5004 Rate / Contract Copy / 2nd Mailing / Non- ... show more |
||
October 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract, breach of which is the basis of this law suit |