Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jerickson Benitez v. Empire Pre-Owned, Buick,Gmc,Caddilac, Victor Stephens
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint, filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, involves plaintiff Jerickson Benitez suing defendants Empire Pre-Owned, Buick, GMC, Cadillac, and Victor Stephens. The complaint alleges that Stephens operated…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: Nov 20, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Nov 20, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Nov 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Nov 20, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 20, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Oct 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 05, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 20, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER WITH CROSSCLAIM |
||
November 20, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
November 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 20, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS And Combined Discovery Demands |
||
October 20, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
October 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EMPIRE PRE-OWNED, BUICK, GMC, CADDILAC |
||
October 05, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VICTOR STEPHENS |
||
September 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |