Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Elon Moore v. Polanco Rodriguez
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Elon Moore, represented by Dreishpoon, Michael, against Polanco Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 31, 2024
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens. The plaintiff, Elon Moore, is suing the defendant, Polanco Rodriguez, for negligence in a car accident that occurred on October 28, 2022. Ac…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 27, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 20, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |