Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In The Matter Of Bay Community Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc. v. The New York State Department Of Health, New York State Emergency Medical Services Council
On June 04, 2024 a special proceedings - cplr article 78 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 04, 2024
Last Refreshed
July 01, 2024
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Agency Action
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves Bay Community Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc. against The New York State Department of Health and New York State Emergency Medical Services Council. The petitioner, a voluntary ambulance service, challenges the decisions m…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 26, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 17, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 07, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jun 04, 2024NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 04, 2024PETITION
Date: Jun 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Jun 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Jun 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Jun 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Jun 04, 2024AFFIRMATION (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Jun 04, 2024ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Jun 04, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: Jun 04, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) 2nd Affirmation of Bradley Pinsky since receiving Exhibit E from state |
|
June 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service upon DOH/SEMSCO |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) ALJ Report |
|
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service upon Department of Health |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service upon the Attorney General |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Application for Ambulance Operating Territory Expansion |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) Notice of Petition |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition | |
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G DOH EMS Policy 06-06 |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Report & Recommendation of Hearing Officer |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Stipulation of Discontinuance of prior Article 78 |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C 7.27.21 Notice of REMSCO vote on application |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Bradley Pinsky in Support of Petition |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Transcript of SEMSCo meeting of 7.7.24 |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |