Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Melis Seker v. Am Usa Express, Inc., Jinli Zhao, E-World Travel & Tours, Inc., And, Easy-Go, Inc., D/B/A Tours4fun
On September 20, 2016 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge LESLIE J. PURIFICACION presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2016
Last Refreshed
July 31, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
1 year, 5 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jul 05, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: May 25, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Mar 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: Mar 02, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: Feb 26, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: Feb 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jan 24, 2018JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: Jan 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jan 24, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Oct 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Aug 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Aug 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Aug 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Aug 22, 2017ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Aug 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Aug 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: Aug 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Aug 22, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: Aug 09, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 04, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 04, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jul 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jul 18, 2017ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: Jul 05, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 23, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2016EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2016EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2016EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2016SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 20, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2018 | hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue |
|
May 25, 2018 | hearing |
NOTE FILED NOTE OF ISSUE DUE Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment and filed & recorded Judgment | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
February 08, 2018 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service and Back | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Notice of Proposed Judgment and Waiver of Costs |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A order with notice of entry |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
August 31, 2017 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PT 39 PRELIM CONF FINAL Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Pertinent Medical Records |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Transcript of Defendant Zhao's Deposition |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Defendant's Motion to Dismiss |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Police Report |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ADMISSION OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Back |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Pertinent Newspaper Articles |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Information from Defendant's Website |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Stipulation |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affirmation of Jordan K. Merson, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Reargue |
|
August 10, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 39 PRELIM CONF Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to adjourn Preliminary Conference |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Order and Notice of Appeal |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service and Back |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service and Back | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
March 09, 2017 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
January 19, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART 011917 E/F Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
January 12, 2017 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PT 39 PRELIM CONF J/T Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Preliminary conference and Easy-Go, Inc. d/b/a Tours4Fun's Motion to Dismiss Stipulation to Adjourn Preliminary conference and Easy-Go, Inc. d/b/a Tours4Fun's Motion to Dismiss ... show more |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant E-World Travel & Tours, Inc.'s Answer with Cross-Claims |
|
December 23, 2016 | Motion |
DISMISS COMPLAINT/PETITION (Motion #001) Decided: 06/27/2017MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: LESLIE J\. PURIFICACION Answer demanded: Yes Judge: LESLIE J. PURIFICACION |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service and Back |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Agreement |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Weiyi Li |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) (RJI) Request for Judicial Intervention and Addendum |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |