Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Otari Chikhladze v. Nazer Mohammed Udin, Avit Transit, Inc., John Doe 1-10, Abc Company 1-10
On July 20, 2015 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 20, 2015
Last Refreshed
September 19, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Bankruptcy
Case Duration
2 years, 1 month and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI)
Date: Sep 11, 2017SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 20, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |