Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Arik Turjman v. Mamadou Ly
On July 17, 2015 a contract (non-commercial) case was filed by Arik Turjman, represented by Rebhun, Jason J., against Mamadou Ly, in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 17, 2015
Last Refreshed
July 23, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Contract (Non-Commercial)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Duration
1 month and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Sep 01, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Jul 17, 2015SUMMONS
Date: Jul 17, 2015EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Jul 17, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Promissory Note |