Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America Na v. Tiffany Watson, The Estate Of Mamie C. Lee, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, The United States Of America Internal Revenue Service Department Of Treasury, Claude E Watson, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Develo…
On July 17, 2015 a foreclosure (residential mortgage) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge Robert J Mcdonald presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 17, 2015
Last Refreshed
July 14, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Toni Cimino;Category
Foreclosure (residential mortgage)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
4 months and 3 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
EXHIBIT(S) - a
Date: Jun 14, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: Jun 14, 2016STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Jun 14, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 14, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 07, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 03, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 30, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 30, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 30, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jul 29, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jul 29, 2015RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Jul 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jul 29, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 28, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 28, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 28, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 28, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jul 28, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 22, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 22, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: Jul 17, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Jul 17, 2015SUMMONS COMPLAINT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jul 17, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 17, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - a filed sc, lp, noa, aos |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
November 19, 2015 | hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: OTHER (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART LOAN REINSTATED DISC FILED 6/14/2016 Judge: TONI CIMINO, CA-R |
|
October 15, 2015 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART Judge: TONI CIMINO, CA-R |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 10, 2015 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 9:30 AM - MANDATORY 8/19/15 AT 2:00 PM Judge: TONI CIMINO, CA-R |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/secretary of housing and urban development |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of mailing/alexus valgean sued herein as jane doe #1 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/alexus valgean sued herein as jane doe #1 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of mailing/occupant |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT aff of service |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/new york state department of taxation & finance |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT mailing |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE rji |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/new york city parking violations bureau |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/new york city environmental control board |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/new york city transit adjudication bureau |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/the united states of america internal revenue service |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/the united states of america internal revenue service |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/secretary of housing and urban development |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |