Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Federal National Mortgage Association v. Jeewan Persaud, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, New York City Environmental Control Board, Sandra Persaud
On July 17, 2015 a foreclosure (residential mortgage) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge TRACY CATAPANO-FOX presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 17, 2015
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Diccia T. Pineda-Kirwan;Judge
Hon. TRACY CATAPANO-FOX
Category
RP-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
1 year, 9 months and 22 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 02, 2018ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: Jan 11, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Nov 14, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Nov 14, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 14, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Feb 03, 2017ORDER - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT ORDER PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: Feb 03, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 03, 2017DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Jan 24, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Oct 28, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 28, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Oct 28, 2016ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: Sep 29, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jun 06, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jun 06, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Jun 06, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 27, 2016ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: Sep 23, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 29, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 28, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 27, 2015SUMMONS COMPLAINT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jul 17, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 17, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 02, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 02, 2018 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 11, 2018 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
December 05, 2017 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #003) Centralized Motion Part STLD BY LOAN MOD, ACTION DISCONTND (Conversion) Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
December 05, 2017 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #003) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART STLD BY LOAN MOD ACTION DISCONTND Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
November 22, 2017 | hearing |
Settled RES FORECLOSURE STATUS CONF PT LOAN PAID OFF (Conversion) Judge: Compliance Conf Judge, |
|
November 22, 2017 | hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE RES FORECLOSURE STATUS CONF PT LOAN PAID OFF Judge: RES FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
November 14, 2017 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 14, 2017 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 14, 2017 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 14, 2017 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 12/18/2017Granted Before Justice: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. Answer demanded: No Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
November 14, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
November 14, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) Attorney Affirmation of Megan Suttel |
||
November 14, 2017 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION / CANCEL N. (Motion #003) Decided: 12/18/2017MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: DICCIA T\. PINEDA-KIRWAN Answer demanded: No Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
October 27, 2017 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
September 06, 2017 | hearing |
Adjourned RES FORECLOSURE STATUS CONF PT 10:00AM (Conversion) Judge: Compliance Conf Judge, |
|
September 06, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED RES FORECLOSURE STATUS CONF PT 10:00AM Judge: RES FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
May 09, 2017 |
JUDGMENT Order/Judgment of Reference & Amendment (SEQ. NO. 2) |
||
February 03, 2017 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE NOTICE OF DIRECTION WITH PROPOSED ORDER |
||
February 03, 2017 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
February 03, 2017 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 24, 2017 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 13, 2016 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
November 29, 2016 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #002) Centralized Motion Part RCVD: 2/07/17, OTC: 04/27/17 (Conversion) Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
November 29, 2016 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #002) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART RCVD: 2/07/17 OTC: 04/27/17 Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
November 22, 2016 | hearing |
Status Conference Held STATUS CONFERENCE PT. F Supreme Trial; FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Catapano-Fox, Tracy A. |
|
November 22, 2016 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE PT. F FINAL Judge: TRACY CATAPANO-FOX, CA-R |
|
November 01, 2016 | Motion |
Appoint - Referee (Motion #002) Decided: 05/01/2017Signed Before Justice: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
November 01, 2016 | Motion |
APPOINT REFEREE (Motion #002) Decided: 05/01/2017ORDER SIGNED Before Justice: DICCIA T\. PINEDA-KIRWAN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
October 28, 2016 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 28, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 28, 2016 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 28, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E FILED SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR FILED SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted |
||
October 28, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION FOR JEEWAN PERSAUD |
||
October 28, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE;PROOF OF COMPLIANCE WITH CPLR 3215 (G) (3) |
||
October 28, 2016 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 28, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C 90 DAY PRE-FORECLOSURE NOTICE;PROOF OF FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 90 DAY PRE-FORECLOSURE NOTICE;PROOF OF FILING Redacted |
||
October 28, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION OF COURTNEY WILLIAMS ESQ |
||
October 28, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G CERTIFICATE OF MERIT |
||
October 28, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B DEMAND LETTER Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEMAND LETTER Redacted |
||
October 28, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE Redacted |
||
October 28, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A AFFIDAVIT;POWER OF ATTORNEY |
||
September 29, 2016 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
July 05, 2016 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Centralized Motion Part Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
July 05, 2016 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
June 09, 2016 | Motion |
Appoint - Referee (Motion #001) Decided: 09/06/2016Denied Before Justice: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Pineda-Kirwan, Hon. Diccia T. |
|
June 09, 2016 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
June 09, 2016 | Motion |
APPOINT REFEREE (Motion #001) Decided: 09/06/2016MOTION DENIED Before Justice: DICCIA T\. PINEDA-KIRWAN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: DICCIA T. PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
June 06, 2016 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 06, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 06, 2016 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 06, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) 90 DAY PRE-FORECLOSURE NOTICES;PROOF OF MAILINGS;PROOF OF FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 90 DAY PRE-FORECLOSURE NOTICES;PROOF OF MAILINGS;PROOF OF FILING Redacted |
||
June 06, 2016 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 06, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) CERTIFICATE OF MERIT |
||
June 06, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) DEMAND LETTER Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEMAND LETTER Redacted |
||
June 06, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE Redacted |
||
June 06, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT |
||
June 06, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) FILED SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR FILED SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted |
||
June 06, 2016 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING PURSUANT TO CPLR 3215 |
||
June 06, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION FOR JEEWAN PERSAUD |
||
June 06, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE;PROOF OF COMPLIANCE WITH CPLR 3215 (G) (3) |
||
June 06, 2016 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 31, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned STATUS CONFERENCE PT. F 2:15 PM (Conversion) Judge: Catapano-Fox, Tracy A. |
|
May 31, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE PT. F 2:15 PM Judge: TRACY CATAPANO-FOX, CA-R |
|
January 27, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 27, 2016 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 27, 2016 |
AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SERVICER CHANGE |
||
September 23, 2015 | ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE | ||
September 11, 2015 | hearing |
Default FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART E Supreme Initial (first time on); 9:30 AM - MANDATORY, 8/20/15 AT 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Catapano-Fox, Tracy A. |
|
September 11, 2015 | hearing |
FSC - DEFAULT (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART E 9:30 AM - MANDATORY 8/20/15 AT 11:00 AM Judge: TRACY CATAPANO-FOX, CA-R |
|
July 29, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARKING |
||
July 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRANSIT |
||
July 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAJ DOE |
||
July 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SINGH DOE |
||
July 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TROY DOE |
||
July 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SANDRA PERSAUD DOE |
||
July 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ENVIRONMENTAL |
||
July 28, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 28, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEEWAN PERSAUD |
||
July 28, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM |
||
July 28, 2015 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
July 27, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 27, 2015 |
AFFIDAVIT 14-008403 TROY DOE (AOM) |
||
July 27, 2015 |
AFFIDAVIT 14-008403 SINGH DOE (AOM) |
||
July 27, 2015 |
AFFIDAVIT 14-008403 SANDRA DOE (AOM) |
||
July 27, 2015 |
AFFIDAVIT 14-008403 RAJ DOE (AOM) |
||
July 17, 2015 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
July 17, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 17, 2015 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
July 17, 2015 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT |