Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Trustee Under Pooling And Servicing Agreement Dated As Of September 1, 2006 Securitized Asset Backed Receivables Llc Trust 2006-He2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-He2 v. Junior Curtis, Marl…
On March 09, 2018 a real property - mortgage foreclosure - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 09, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 29, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Duration
3 months and 4 days
Overview
Causes of Action
I. On its First Cause of Action:
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: Jun 12, 2018NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Jun 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 27, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 27, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 27, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 26, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Mar 23, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Mar 09, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Mar 09, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Mar 09, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos marlene curtis |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos junoir curtis |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom junoir curtis |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom occupants |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MIDLAND FUNDING |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MERS |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING statement of authorization |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY |