Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nassan L. Barrett v. Clive A. Sherwood, Albert A. Sherwood
On July 29, 2015 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge ROBERT J. MCDONALD presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Filing Court House
Queens County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 9 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jun 04, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jan 22, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 08, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 08, 2017ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: Feb 11, 2016SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 29, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 09, 2018 | hearing |
Settled - Other TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
May 09, 2018 | hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TRIAL SCHEDULING PART Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 16, 2018 | hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) Centralized Motion Part SOS (Conversion) Judge: Part, Centralized Motion |
|
January 16, 2018 | hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART SOS Judge: CENTRALIZED MOTION PART |
|
December 11, 2017 | Motion |
Vacate/Strike - Note of Issue/Jury Demand/From Trial Calendar (Motion #001) Decided: 01/16/2018Withdrawn Before Justice: Part, Centralized Motion Answer demanded: No Judge: Part, Centralized Motion |
|
December 11, 2017 | Motion |
VACATE NOTE OF ISSUE (Motion #001) Decided: 01/16/2018MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Answer demanded: No Judge: CENTRALIZED MOTION PART |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 08, 2017 | hearing |
Note of Issue Filed NOTE OF ISSUE DUE Judge: McDonald, Hon. Robert J. |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Post NOI Good Faith Letter |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Note of Issue |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Defendant's Demands and Further Demands |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) CC Order |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) PC Order |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Motion to Strike |
|
December 08, 2017 | hearing |
NOTE FILED NOTE OF ISSUE DUE Judge: ROBERT J. MCDONALD |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
April 05, 2017 | hearing |
Held Compliance Conference Part Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: McDonald, Hon. Robert J. |
|
April 05, 2017 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Judge: ROBERT J. MCDONALD |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
October 12, 2016 | hearing |
Preliminary Conference Part Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: McDonald, Hon. Robert J. |
|
October 12, 2016 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PT 34 PRELIM CONF Judge: ROBERT J. MCDONALD |
|
September 28, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned Preliminary Conference Part Judge: McDonald, Hon. Robert J. |
|
September 28, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 34 PRELIM CONF Judge: ROBERT J. MCDONALD |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE to Queens County (Certified Copy from Queens) |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Albert A. Sherwood |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Clive A. Sherwood |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |