Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WILSON-FLEMMING, A-NA BETHINA vs. FLEMMING, PAUL
A Matrimonial Contested case was filed in the jurisdiction of Queens County. Judge Sidney F. Strauss presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 02, 2007
Last Refreshed
October 22, 2021
Filing Location
Queens County, NY
Category
MATRIMONIAL CONTESTED
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2010 | hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) JHO MATRIMONIAL PT DISC |
|
July 21, 2010 | hearing |
ADJOURNED JHO MATRIMONIAL PT ANDERSON Judge: ELIZABETH A. ANDERSON, CA-R |
|
June 22, 2010 | hearing |
ADJOURNED JHO MATRIMONIAL PT ANDERSON Judge: ELIZABETH A. ANDERSON, CA-R |
|
May 14, 2010 | hearing |
ADJOURNED JHO MATRIMONIAL PT ANDERSON Judge: ELIZABETH A. ANDERSON, CA-R |
|
April 26, 2010 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM FINAL ADJ. LTRS FXD TO CSLS. Judge: BERNICE DAUN SIEGAL |
|
April 05, 2010 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 2PM Judge: BERNICE DAUN SIEGAL |
|
March 09, 2010 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM FINAL! Judge: BERNICE DAUN SIEGAL |
|
February 18, 2010 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: BERNICE DAUN SIEGAL |
|
December 17, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9AM FIN Judge: SIDNEY F. STRAUSS-53 |
|
September 15, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9AM FINAL ADJ. Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
August 06, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
June 30, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
May 21, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
March 31, 2009 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) PT 53 MOTIONS MATRIMONIAL SBMT. Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
March 31, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
March 24, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PT 53 MOTIONS MATRIMONIAL 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
March 24, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
March 03, 2009 | Motion |
DIRECT DISCOVERY/BILL OF PART. (Motion #002) Decided: 08/03/2009SEE DECISION Before Justice: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE Answer demanded: No Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
March 03, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PT 53 MOTIONS MATRIMONIAL 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
March 03, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
January 13, 2009 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRETRIAL CONF MATRIMONIA 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
November 18, 2008 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
September 30, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
July 24, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF 9 AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
July 02, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: JOSEPH P. DORSA |
|
June 10, 2008 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: JOSEPH P. DORSA |
|
May 06, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: JOSEPH P. DORSA |
|
April 09, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: JOSEPH P. DORSA |
|
April 03, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: JOSEPH P. DORSA |
|
February 21, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
January 10, 2008 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
November 28, 2007 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) PT 53 MOTIONS MATRIMONIAL SUBMISSION 1/10/08 CONTROL Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
November 20, 2007 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PT 53 MOTIONS MATRIMONIAL SUBMISSION 1/10/08 CONTROL Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
October 11, 2007 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PT 53 MOTIONS MATRIMONIAL OSC OSC Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
October 11, 2007 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PT 53 PRELIM CONF MATRIMONIAL Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
October 02, 2007 | Motion |
TEMPORARY CUSTODY (Motion #001) Decided: 02/19/2008SEE DECISION Before Justice: Joseph P\. Dorsa Answer demanded: No Judge: JOSEPH P. DORSA |
|
October 02, 2007 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PT 53 MOTIONS MATRIMONIAL OSC OSC Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |
|
October 02, 2007 | hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 53 PRELIM CONF MATRIMONIAL PC=9:30AM Judge: MARYELLEN FITZMAURICE |