Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D/B/A Mr. Cooper v. Kevin Hurst a/k/a Kevin F. Hurst, Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, John Doe Said Name Being Fictitious It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate…
On October 31, 2017 a real property - mortgage foreclosure - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY. Judge John R Lindstrom presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2017
Last Refreshed
July 30, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Filing Court House
Orange County Supreme Court
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 14, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 1)
Date: Jan 28, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 1)
Date: Jan 28, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Jan 28, 2019ANSWER
Date: Feb 06, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 01, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 31, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1) | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF SETTLEMENT |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER TO DISCONTINUE |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) MOTION |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KEVIN HURST |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Additional Notice of Pendency |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BLOOM & BLOOM P.C AFF BY MAIL |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KEVIN HURST |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS 1303 |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HUDSON VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Waiver in Foreclosire |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |