Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Jacqueline L Hirschthal
On October 31, 2017 an other matters - consumer credit (card) original creditor plaintiff case was filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., represented by Hunt, James T, against Jacqueline L Hirschthal, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2017
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Filing Court House
Orange County Supreme Court
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Case Duration
2 months and 30 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Nov 07, 2017SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 31, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |