Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Hudson City Savings Bank v. Joseph Di Bello Aka Joseph Dibello Aka Joseph A Dibello, Janet Di Bello Aka Janet Dibello, Hometown Bank Of The Hudson Valley, John Doe, Jane Doe
On October 31, 2017 a real property - mortgage foreclosure - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY. Judge Elena Goldberg-Velazquez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2017
Last Refreshed
July 30, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Filing Court House
Orange County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Elena Goldberg-Velazquez
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
2 years, 4 months and 11 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Mar 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Mar 09, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Dec 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Dec 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Oct 25, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Oct 25, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Sep 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Aug 31, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Jul 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jul 01, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Apr 26, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Apr 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Mar 31, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Feb 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Feb 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Aug 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 3) Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 3) Note Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 3) Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 3) Certificate of Merit Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 3) Notice of Default Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 3) Mortgage Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 3)
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 3) 90 Day Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 3) Summons and Complaint Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 3) LP Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 3) Service Affidavits Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 3) 3215 Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 3) Affidavit of Merit Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 3) Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 3) Power of Attorney Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 3) 8-3-21 Letter Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 3) 3-12-20 Order Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - p (Motion 3) 11-20-20 Conference Order Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 3) 4-8-21 Court Notice Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 3) 10-7-20 Order Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 3) Affirmation of Regularity Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 18, 2021AFFIRMATION Military Service Affirmation Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 13, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Aug 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Aug 03, 2021AFFIRMATION Military Search Affirmation Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 02, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: Apr 08, 2021FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: Nov 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 11, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: Nov 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 19, 2020DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Oct 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 30, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Sep 02, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: Sep 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 2)
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 2)
Date: Sep 01, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: Sep 01, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 2) Title Report Schedule D Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 2) Contract of Sale Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 2) Tax Certification Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 2)
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 2) Repayment Plans Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 01, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion 2) Military Service Affirmation Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 2)
Date: Sep 01, 2020DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Mar 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1) NOTE Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 1) MILITARY SERVICE AFFIDAVIT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 1) NOTICE OF DEFAULT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 1) 90 DAY NOTICE Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 1) MORTGAGE Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT Military Service Affidavit Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jan 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: Dec 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 27, 2017SUMMONS COMPLAINT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Oct 31, 2017NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Oct 31, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 09, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court - Status Update |
||
December 21, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 14, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
October 25, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
October 25, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 02, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 31, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
July 01, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
May 02, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 26, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
April 04, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT control date for status |
||
March 31, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
February 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 18, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Update |
||
August 19, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3) Letter request to withdraw motion and to notify the court regarding the death of the borrowers, with ... show more Redacted per 22 NYCRR Letter request to withdraw motion and to notify the court regarding the death of the borrowers, with ... show more Redacted |
||
August 19, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 18, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 18, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR Note Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR Certificate of Merit Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Default Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR Mortgage Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) Military Service Affirmation |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) 90 Day Redacted per 22 NYCRR 90 Day Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons and Complaint Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) LP Redacted per 22 NYCRR LP Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) Service Affidavits Redacted per 22 NYCRR Service Affidavits Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #3) 3215 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 3215 Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #3) Affidavit of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Merit Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #3) Power of Attorney Redacted per 22 NYCRR Power of Attorney Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #3) 8-3-21 Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 8-3-21 Letter Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #3) 3-12-20 Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR 3-12-20 Order Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - p (Motion #3) 11-20-20 Conference Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR 11-20-20 Conference Order Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #3) 4-8-21 Court Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR 4-8-21 Court Notice Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #3) 10-7-20 Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR 10-7-20 Order Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #3) Affirmation of Regularity Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affirmation of Regularity Redacted |
||
August 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Military Service Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR Military Service Affirmation Redacted |
||
August 03, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 03, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Military Search Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR Military Search Affirmation Redacted |
||
April 08, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 20, 2020 | FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
November 11, 2020 | Affidavit of Mailing Conference Notice | ||
November 04, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 19, 2020 | Affidavit of Mailing Conference Notice | ||
October 07, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 30, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Prior Motion for Order of Reference Redacted per 22 NYCRR Prior Motion for Order of Reference Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 01, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) 3-12-20 Order |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) Tax Petition |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #2) Loan Application and Appraisal Redacted per 22 NYCRR Loan Application and Appraisal Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Loss Mitigation Correspondence Redacted per 22 NYCRR Loss Mitigation Correspondence Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION Military Service Affirmation |
||
September 01, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Title Report Schedule D Redacted per 22 NYCRR Title Report Schedule D Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Contract of Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract of Sale Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #2) Tax Certification Redacted per 22 NYCRR Tax Certification Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) E-mail Correspondence |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #2) Repayment Plans Redacted per 22 NYCRR Repayment Plans Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Requesting Conference 157 |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #2) Military Service Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR Military Service Affirmation Redacted |
||
September 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #2) Affirmation |
||
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF REFERENCE |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF REFERENCE |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER OF REFERENCE AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) NOTE Redacted per 22 NYCRR NOTE Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) MILITARY SERVICE AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR MILITARY SERVICE AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CPLR 3012-b |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) NOTICE OF DEFAULT Redacted per 22 NYCRR NOTICE OF DEFAULT Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL PURSUANT TO CPLR 3215 (G) (3) |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) 90 DAY NOTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 90 DAY NOTICE Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) MORTGAGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR MORTGAGE Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) LIMITED POWER OF ATTORNEY |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF REGULARITY |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Military Service Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR Military Service Affidavit Redacted |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY |