Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc v. David R. Dinino, Kayla E. Dinino, John Doe 1-JOHN DOE 12 THE LAST TWELVE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS AND UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF,THE PERSONS OR PARTIES INTENDED BEING THE TENANTS, OCCUPANTS, PERSONS OR CORPS, IF ANY, HAVING OR C…
On August 13, 2018 a real property - mortgage foreclosure - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Filing Court House
Orange County Supreme Court
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Duration
7 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Mar 25, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 22, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 20, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 13, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - DAVID R. DININO |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215-KAYLA E. DININO |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DAVID R DININO |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KAYLA E DININO |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY |